Insider Shareholders with Direct Ownership of Fs Bancorp, Inc. (FSBW)
This section provides a comprehensive overview of the insiders with direct ownership of Fs Bancorp, Inc. (FSBW). You can find detailed information about the size and nature of each insider's ownership stake, as well as the latest updates on their holdings.
FS Bancorp, Inc. Insider List
Insider | Adquired | Disposed | Held | # of Trades | Last Transaction |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph C. Adams
Director/CEO |
158,058 | 116,357 | 125,149 $5.64 Million | 24 |
Aug 26, 2024
Reduced 20.56%
|
Matthew D. Mullet
President, CFO |
56,150 | 25,181 | 100,999 $4.55 Million | 18 |
Aug 20, 2024
Reduced 9.98%
|
Michael J. Mansfield
Director |
11,405 | 0 | 68,932 $3.11 Million | 11 |
Aug 15, 2024
Added 1.08%
|
Ted A. Leech
Director |
14,947 | 242 | 46,658 $2.1 Million | 18 |
Aug 15, 2024
Added 1.58%
|
Dennis V O'Leary
Chief Lending Officer |
27,000 | 27,250 | 46,290 $2.09 Million | 9 |
Aug 15, 2022
Reduced 3.82%
|
Erin Burr
CRO & CRA Officer, EVP |
23,202 | 3,851 | 25,841 $1.16 Million | 17 |
Aug 15, 2024
Added 7.18%
|
Victoria Jarman
CHR & WOW! Officer, EVP |
12,508 | 0 | 19,800 $892,386 | 14 |
Aug 15, 2024
Added 9.17%
|
Margaret R. Piesik
Director |
26,422 | 27,002 | 14,918 $672,354 | 28 |
Aug 15, 2024
Added 4.79%
|
Kelli Nielsen
EVP Retail Banking/Marketing |
7,985 | 2,361 | 14,884 $670,821 | 7 |
Aug 15, 2024
Reduced 5.11%
|
Ben Crowl
Chief Lending Officer |
10,890 | 3,650 | 14,743 $664,467 | 9 |
Aug 15, 2024
Added 14.5%
|
Pamela Marie Andrews
Director |
6,952 | 0 | 11,250 $507,037 | 11 |
Aug 15, 2024
Added 6.25%
|
Marina Cofer Wildsmith
Director |
3,828 | 420 | 8,910 $401,573 | 15 |
Aug 15, 2024
Added 7.76%
|
Joseph P. Zavaglia
Director |
8,147 | 5,955 | 8,594 $387,331 | 19 |
Aug 15, 2024
Reduced 1.43%
|
Shana Allen
Chief Information Officer |
5,066 | 137 | 4,863 $219,175 | 7 |
Aug 15, 2024
Reduced 2.74%
|
Donn C Costa
EVP, Home Lending |
6,470 | 31,685 | 3,382 $152,426 | 16 |
Aug 06, 2024
Added 3.51%
|
Robert A Nesbitt
Chief Credit Oper Officer |
1,814 | 68 | 2,732 $123,131 | 3 |
Aug 15, 2024
Reduced 2.43%
|
Sean Mc Cormick
Chief Credit Administration |
1,800 | 0 | 1,800 $81,126 | 1 |
Aug 15, 2024
Added 50.0%
|
Terri L Degner
Director |
1,926 | 0 | 1,750 $78,872 | 4 |
Aug 15, 2024
Added 50.0%
|
Lisa Cleary
Chief Operating Officer |
7,293 | 0 | 29 $1,307 | 4 |
Nov 04, 2022
Added 45.28%
|
Robert B Fuller
Retired Chief Credit Officer |
24,444 | 52,984 | 0 $0 | 18 |
Aug 25, 2023
Reduced 100.0%
|
8,000 | 10,240 | 0 $0 | 8 |
Jun 02, 2022
Reduced 100.0%
|
|
Fs Bancorp, Inc.
Chief Credit Officer |
0 | 290 | 0 $0 | 1 |
Aug 04, 2023
Reduced 100.0%
|